Vice-Presidents
Vice-Presidents of the University of Ottawa.
Jacques Beauvais 鈥 Provost and Vice-President Academic Affairs
Jacques Beauvais was named Provost and Vice-President, Academic Affairs on June 19th, 2024. His term will end on June 30th, 2029.
Sylvain Charbonneau 鈥 Vice-President, Research and Innovation
Sylvain Charbonneau took office as on January 29, 2018. His term will end on June 30, 2028.
Vice-President, International and Francophonie
Vacant
Julien Sicard 鈥 Vice-President, Advancement
Julien Sicard took office as Vice-President, Advancement, on June 3, 2024. His term will end on June 2, 2029.
Jennifer Doyle 鈥 Vice-President, Finance and Administration
Jennifer Doyle took office as Vice-President, Finance and Administration on March 1, 2021. Her term will end on June 30, 2026.
Annick Bergeron 鈥 Secretary-General
Annick Bergeron took office as Secretary-General on December 18, 2017.